The governor of Jharkhand is a nominal head of the Indian state of Jharkhand and permanent representative of president of India. The governor is appointed by the president of India for a five-year term. Raj Bhavan in Ranchi serves as the official residence. Since 18 February 2024, the governor of … Meer weergeven The governor enjoys many different types of powers: • Executive powers related to administration, appointments and removals, • Legislative powers related to lawmaking … Meer weergeven • Governor (India) • Government of India • Government of Jharkhand Meer weergeven • http://rajbhavanjharkhand.nic.in/ Meer weergeven WebMinisters & Portfolio Government of Jharkhand State Shri. Nilkanth Singh Munda Development, Rural Works Panchayati Raj & NREP (Special Division) Shri. Chandreshwar Prasad Singh Urban Development, Housing, Registration, Disaster Management Shri. Randhir Kumar Singh Agriculture & Sugarcane Development, Animal Husbandry & …
Who
Web15 rijen · Two chief ministers, Shibu Soren and his son Hemant Soren, represented the … Web17 sep. 2024 · Draupadi Murmu is the first woman governor of Jharkhand. A.K. Kidwai is the longest-serving Governor, serving as Governors for Bihar, West Bengal, and Haryana. Articles 157 and 158 of the Constitution of India deal with the eligibility requirements of a Governor of India. data security breaches examples
State-wise List of Indian Governors - DataFlair
WebGovernor Took Office Left Office; Prabhat Kumar: 15 November 2000: 3 February 2002: M. Rama Jois: 15 July 2002: 11 June 2003: Ved Marwah: 12 June 2003: 9 December 2004: … WebList of governors of Jharkhand. The governor of Jharkhand is a nominal head of the Indian state of Jharkhand and permanent representative of president of India. [1] The governor … Web12 feb. 2024 · President of India Droupadi Murmu on Sunday appointed governors in 12 states and a Union Territory while accepting the resignation of two — Maharashtra’s … data security field checkr